U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shelton, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2023: [In Camera Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest - Other District]
  • January 05, 2023: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 04, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.