U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00360-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bardomiano-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2023
  • September 29, 2023: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2023
  • July 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2023
  • June 30, 2023: [Order]
  • June 30, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2023: [Order]
  • June 07, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 11, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 10, 2023: [Continue Trial]
April, 2023
  • April 10, 2023: [Order]
  • April 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2023
  • March 28, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2023: [Order]
  • March 28, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2023: [Continue Trial]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 12, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.