U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript]
July, 2023
  • July 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • July 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2023
  • April 17, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2023: [Order]
  • April 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
March, 2023
  • March 24, 2023: [Release of Funds]
February, 2023
  • February 22, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 27, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 27, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.