U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOBLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2023
  • June 08, 2023: [Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2023
  • February 09, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.