U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SWANSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Supervision]
  • May 08, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Supervision]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2024
  • January 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
November, 2023
  • November 21, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 21, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • November 21, 2023: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • November 09, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2023: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • November 02, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 02, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2023
  • October 31, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 31, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 31, 2023: [Variance]
  • October 31, 2023: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2023
  • August 11, 2023: [Order]
  • August 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 27, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
May, 2023
  • May 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • May 12, 2023: [1 - Exparte Document - use ONLY with other selection]
  • May 12, 2023: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • May 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 12, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2023
  • April 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 06, 2023: [Release from Custody]
  • April 06, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Order]
February, 2023
  • February 13, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 10, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.