U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ryals
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 16, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 29, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2023
  • May 17, 2023: [Order]
  • May 16, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 16, 2023: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • May 16, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 16, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2023: [Oral Order]
March, 2023
  • March 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.