U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
October, 2023
  • October 18, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2023: [Order]
  • October 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2023
  • August 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order]
  • August 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 26, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 26, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2023
  • May 23, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • May 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
March, 2023
  • March 03, 2023: [Order]
  • March 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.