U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 09, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
October, 2023
  • October 02, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2023
  • September 11, 2023: [Order]
  • September 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2023
  • August 21, 2023: [Response to Motion]
July, 2023
  • July 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2023
  • June 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2023: [Order]
  • June 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2023: [Extend Time]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2023: [Order]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2023
  • March 14, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 14, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.