U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALDON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2023
  • July 18, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2023
  • June 09, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
March, 2023
  • March 28, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 14, 2023: [Order]
  • March 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.