U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 28, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2023: [Order]
  • December 28, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 10, 2023: [Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 05, 2023: [Release from Custody]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Continue Trial]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 12, 2023: [Continue Trial]
April, 2023
  • April 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [Continue Trial]
March, 2023
  • March 22, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 22, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2023: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.