U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00312-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 27, 2023: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2023: [Strike]
August, 2023
  • August 29, 2023: [Order]
  • August 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 25, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 25, 2023: [Order]
  • August 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2023: [Order]
  • April 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
March, 2023
  • March 29, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 28, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.