U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCWILLIAMS, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • April 21, 2025: [Electronic Availability of ROA]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: [Variance]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2023
  • December 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2023: [Order]
  • December 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 11, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 11, 2023: [Witness List]
  • December 11, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2023: [In Limine]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [Order]
  • November 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2023
  • October 17, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 27, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 20, 2023: [Continue]
July, 2023
  • July 14, 2023: [Order]
  • July 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 16, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2023: [Suppress]
May, 2023
  • May 30, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2023: [Order]
  • May 18, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2023: [Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.