U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOLDSMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 17, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 07, 2023: [Order]
  • August 07, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2023
  • June 23, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2023
  • April 26, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 10, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.