U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 10, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2023
  • September 26, 2023: [Order]
  • September 26, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
May, 2023
  • May 26, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2023: [Order]
  • May 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 17, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.