U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilmore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • December 01, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 01, 2023: [Order]
  • December 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 28, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 28, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 22, 2023: [Variance]
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2023: [Order]
  • May 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2023: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 12, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • May 12, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 12, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
April, 2023
  • April 28, 2023: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.