U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MINEFIELD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript]
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2023: [Order]
  • November 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
May, 2023
  • May 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.