U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WELLS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • December 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2023
  • November 27, 2023: [Variance]
  • November 27, 2023: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
  • November 27, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2023
  • September 08, 2023: [Order]
  • September 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2023
  • August 29, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 29, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2023
  • June 12, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2023: [Order]
  • June 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Detention]
May, 2023
  • May 23, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.