U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burroughs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
  • November 17, 2024: [Witness List]
November, 2023
  • November 14, 2023: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
  • November 10, 2023: [Order]
  • November 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 06, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 06, 2023: [Trial Brief]
  • November 02, 2023: [Trial Brief]
  • November 02, 2023: [Notice of Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
October, 2023
  • October 30, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 30, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 30, 2023: [Stipulation to Jury]
September, 2023
  • September 08, 2023: [Brief/Response in Opposition]
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 02, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
July, 2023
  • July 26, 2023: [Suppress]
  • July 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 05, 2023: [Extend Time]
June, 2023
  • June 28, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.