U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Order on Motion to Produce]
December, 2023
  • December 06, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2023
  • October 30, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2023
  • September 05, 2023: [Order]
  • September 05, 2023: [Status Conference]
August, 2023
  • August 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 15, 2023: [Order]
  • June 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 13, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.