U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perryman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 02, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2024: [Variance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 25, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2023
  • September 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2023
  • August 10, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 10, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
July, 2023
  • July 31, 2023: [Order]
  • July 31, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2023: [Order]
  • July 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 06, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2023
  • June 26, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 13, 2023: [Detention]
  • June 13, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.