U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HATCHER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Order]
  • January 16, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 16, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
November, 2023
  • November 30, 2023: [Order]
  • November 30, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2023: [Indictment]
August, 2023
  • August 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
July, 2023
  • July 27, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order]
June, 2023
  • June 26, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.