U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00191-6
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTIN, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • April 22, 2025: [Electronic Availability of ROA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2024
  • October 19, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Electronic Availability of ROA]
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 01, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Order]
  • January 17, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference Order]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 19, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 13, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • December 13, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
November, 2023
  • November 29, 2023: [Order]
  • November 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 07, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order]
October, 2023
  • October 20, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2023: [Order]
  • October 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 06, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2023: [Order]
  • October 05, 2023: [Order]
  • October 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 06, 2023: [Strike]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • August 15, 2023: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 14, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2023: [Release from Custody]
July, 2023
  • July 21, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 20, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2023: [Detention]
  • July 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 05, 2023: [Notice of Limited Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 05, 2023: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2023: [Order]
June, 2023
  • June 27, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.