U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILL, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2023
  • October 02, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2023
  • August 15, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2023
  • July 21, 2023: [Order]
  • July 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2023: [Order]
  • July 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.