U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ATKINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • January 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 09, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • January 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2023
  • October 05, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 17, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order]
  • August 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 24, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • July 24, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.