U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 03, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • January 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Variance]
  • December 15, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
August, 2023
  • August 31, 2023: [Order]
  • August 30, 2023: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • August 30, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 16, 2023: [Order]
  • August 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.