U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00189-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEARCY, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Order]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 27, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 19, 2023: [Detention]
September, 2023
  • September 29, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • September 29, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • September 29, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 22, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2023
  • August 30, 2023: [Order]
  • August 30, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.