U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 10, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal]
December, 2023
  • December 07, 2023: [Strike]
  • December 06, 2023: [1 - Exparte Document - use ONLY with other selection]
  • December 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 04, 2023: [Order]
  • December 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2023
  • November 29, 2023: [Order]
  • November 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
September, 2023
  • September 26, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • September 26, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • September 26, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2023: [Arrest ]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.