U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandlin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2023
  • October 31, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 19, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2023
  • September 28, 2023: [Order]
  • September 25, 2023: [Strike]
  • September 25, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.