U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RHINE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 03, 2024: [Order]
  • January 03, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
September, 2023
  • September 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2023: [Oral Order]
August, 2023
  • August 21, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.