U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARPENTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • October 07, 2024: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2023
  • October 13, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • October 03, 2023: [Continue Trial]
August, 2023
  • August 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.