U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00267-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 21, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • November 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2023: [Status Conference]
September, 2023
  • September 18, 2023: [Order]
  • September 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • September 06, 2023: [Order]
  • September 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 05, 2023: [Status Conference]
August, 2023
  • August 24, 2023: [Order]
  • August 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.