U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AVERY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Order]
  • January 11, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 11, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2024: [Continue Trial]
December, 2023
  • December 08, 2023: [Status Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 30, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
August, 2023
  • August 29, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 29, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • August 29, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • August 29, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • August 28, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.