U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PELTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
December, 2023
  • December 26, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 19, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • December 15, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
October, 2023
  • October 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
September, 2023
  • September 20, 2023: [Order]
  • September 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.