U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rudolph
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.