U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBBINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Order]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
December, 2023
  • December 29, 2023: [Order]
  • December 29, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 18, 2023: [Continue]
  • December 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • December 06, 2023: [Order]
  • December 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2023
  • November 27, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2023: [Order]
  • November 24, 2023: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
October, 2023
  • October 20, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.