U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00304-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COBB
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 08, 2024: [Order]
  • January 08, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2023
  • November 30, 2023: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 29, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • November 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [Order]
  • November 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 09, 2023: [Order]
  • November 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • October 13, 2023: [Order]
  • October 13, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2023
  • September 26, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.