U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCKENZIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2023
  • October 23, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 19, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 19, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • October 13, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2023: [Order]
  • October 11, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.