U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00323-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2023
  • November 21, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2023
  • October 20, 2023: [Transfer In Probationer/Supervised Release]
  • October 20, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.