U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Per Curiam Opinion]
January, 2024
  • January 04, 2024: [Order]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2023
  • December 22, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2023: [Order]
  • December 22, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2023: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • December 12, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2023: [Order]
November, 2023
  • November 06, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
October, 2023
  • October 30, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.