U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00311-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHEPPARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Oral Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 24, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 23, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Response to Court Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
November, 2023
  • November 29, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2023
  • October 31, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.