U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00351-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HICKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 07, 2023: [Continue Trial]
November, 2023
  • November 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.