U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00348-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WARE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Order]
  • January 19, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2024: [Continue Trial]
  • January 16, 2024: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2023: [Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2023
  • November 30, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 30, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2023: [Order]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order]
  • November 06, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.