U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00350-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2023
  • December 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • December 19, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • December 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • December 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
November, 2023
  • November 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order]
  • November 14, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.