U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00347-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Floyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 17, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2024: [Order]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • December 27, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • December 11, 2023: [Suppress]
November, 2023
  • November 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2023: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.