U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00402-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BILLINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2023
  • December 07, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2023: [Order]
  • December 07, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • December 07, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.