U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00354-1
  • Case Name: USA v. UTNICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Per Curiam Opinion]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 08, 2024: [Release from Custody]
December, 2023
  • December 13, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • December 11, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.