U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Documents]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 10, 2025: [Exclude]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: [In Limine]
  • February 08, 2025: [Response]
  • February 07, 2025: [Response]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Compel ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.