U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00070-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Perciavalle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.