U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2024: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.