U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saizan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 24, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 20, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Variance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.